Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1464 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2902 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#814 | Journal Page: 2901 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2901 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2901 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#748 | Journal Page: 2791 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2791 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 2790 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2790 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1446 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 852 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 852 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed |