Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1018
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3221
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3221
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 3219
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3219
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 748
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 748
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|