Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2835 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: King of Taylor (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2835
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2015;
33 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
44 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
55 following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 3; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
66 Click here to see the committee vote
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to the name of the program serving certain persons with
1212 special health care needs and prioritizing services provided under
1313 the program.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. The legislature finds that:
1616 (1) when proposing, adopting, or amending the rules of
1717 the Department of State Health Services, or the Health and Human
1818 Services Commission and when publishing new or amended reference
1919 materials, publications, or electronic media, the name of the
2020 Children with Special Health Care Needs Services Program should be
2121 changed to accurately reflect that the program provides services to
2222 persons other than children, including persons 21 years of age and
2323 older who have cystic fibrosis;
2424 (2) as of January 31, 2015, persons not lawfully
2525 present in the United States constituted two-thirds the total
2626 number of persons served by the program;
2727 (3) as of January 31, 2015, the program's waiting list
2828 for services consisted of 178 persons, more than half of whom were
2929 identified as persons not lawfully present in the United States;
3030 (4) if because of financial limitations the program is
3131 unable to serve all persons eligible for services under the
3232 program, some persons placed on the program's waiting list may not
3333 receive the services;
3434 (5) the only authority the state may exercise to
3535 address the limited availability of services when financial
3636 limitations exist is for the state to give priority for services to
3737 citizens of the United States who are on the program's waiting list;
3838 and
3939 (6) it is the policy of this state that, when financial
4040 limitations restrict the number of persons served by the program,
4141 citizens of the United States who are on the program's waiting list
4242 for services should be given priority over persons not lawfully
4343 present in the United States.
4444 SECTION 2. The heading to Chapter 35, Health and Safety
4545 Code, is amended to read as follows:
4646 CHAPTER 35. TEXAS [CHILDREN WITH] SPECIAL HEALTH CARE NEEDS PROGRAM
4747 SECTION 3. Section 35.001, Health and Safety Code, is
4848 amended to read as follows:
4949 Sec. 35.001. SHORT TITLE; REFERENCE IN OTHER LAW. (a) This
5050 chapter may be cited as the Texas [Children with] Special Health
5151 Care Needs Program [Services] Act.
5252 (b) A reference in other law to the Children with Special
5353 Health Care Needs Services Program means the program administered
5454 under this chapter.
5555 SECTION 4. Section 35.0021, Health and Safety Code, is
5656 amended by adding Subdivision (6-a) and amending Subdivision (8) to
5757 read as follows:
5858 (6-a) "Person with special health care needs" has the
5959 meaning assigned by Section 35.0022.
6060 (8) "Program" means the services program for persons
6161 [children] with special health care needs.
6262 SECTION 5. Section 35.0022, Health and Safety Code, is
6363 amended to read as follows:
6464 Sec. 35.0022. PERSON [CHILD] WITH SPECIAL HEALTH CARE
6565 NEEDS. (a) In this chapter, "person [child] with special health
6666 care needs" means a person who:
6767 (1) is younger than 21 years of age and who has a
6868 chronic physical or developmental condition; or
6969 (2) has cystic fibrosis, regardless of the person's
7070 age.
7171 (b) The term "person ["child] with special health care
7272 needs" may include a person who has a behavioral or emotional
7373 condition that accompanies the person's physical or developmental
7474 condition. The term does not include a person who has a behavioral
7575 or emotional condition without having an accompanying physical or
7676 developmental condition.
7777 (c) A reference in this chapter to a "child with special
7878 health care needs" means a "person with special health care needs"
7979 and a reference to a "child" means a "person."
8080 SECTION 6. The heading to Section 35.003, Health and Safety
8181 Code, is amended to read as follows:
8282 Sec. 35.003. SERVICES PROGRAM FOR PERSONS [CHILDREN] WITH
8383 SPECIAL HEALTH CARE NEEDS.
8484 SECTION 7. Section 35.003, Health and Safety Code, is
8585 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (d) and adding Subsection
8686 (c-1) to read as follows:
8787 (a) The program is in the department to provide services to
8888 eligible persons [children] with special health care needs. The
8989 program shall provide:
9090 (1) early identification of persons [children] with
9191 special health care needs;
9292 (2) diagnosis and evaluation of persons [children]
9393 with special health care needs;
9494 (3) rehabilitation services to persons [children]
9595 with special health care needs;
9696 (4) development and improvement of standards and
9797 services for persons [children] with special health care needs;
9898 (5) case management services;
9999 (6) other family support services; and
100100 (7) access to health benefits plan coverage under
101101 Section 35.0031.
102102 (c-1) To the extent allowed by federal law, the executive
103103 commissioner shall adopt rules requiring the department to give
104104 priority for services provided under the program to an eligible
105105 person who is placed on a waiting list under Subsection (c) based on
106106 the following criteria in order of importance:
107107 (1) the acuity of the person's medical condition;
108108 (2) whether the person is a United States citizen or a
109109 qualified alien as that term is defined by 8 U.S.C. Section 1641(b);
110110 (3) the amount of time the person has been on the
111111 waiting list; and
112112 (4) any other factors considered relevant by the
113113 department.
114114 (d) The program may provide:
115115 (1) transportation and subsistence for an eligible
116116 person [child] with special health care needs and the person's
117117 [child's] parent, managing conservator, guardian, or other adult
118118 caretaker approved by the program to obtain services provided by
119119 the program; and
120120 (2) the following services to an eligible person
121121 [child] with special health care needs who dies in an approved
122122 facility outside the person's [child's] municipality of residence
123123 while receiving program services:
124124 (A) the transportation of the person's [child's]
125125 remains, and the transportation of a parent or other person
126126 accompanying the remains, from the facility to the place of burial
127127 in this state that is designated by the parent or other person
128128 legally responsible for interment;
129129 (B) the expense of embalming, if required for
130130 transportation;
131131 (C) the cost of a coffin purchased at a minimum
132132 price, if a coffin is required for transportation; and
133133 (D) any other necessary expenses directly
134134 related to the care and return of the person's [child's] remains to
135135 the place of burial in this state.
136136 SECTION 8. The changes in law made by this Act apply to an
137137 eligible person placed on a waiting list under Section 35.003(c),
138138 Health and Safety Code, following an initial determination or
139139 redetermination of the person's eligibility for services under
140140 Chapter 35, Health and Safety Code, that is made on or after the
141141 effective date of this Act.
142142 SECTION 9. Not later than September 1, 2019, the name of the
143143 Children with Special Health Care Needs Program operated under
144144 Chapter 35, Health and Safety Code, must be updated in applicable
145145 rules and reference materials, publications, and electronic media
146146 to reflect the change in law made by this Act. Before that date, the
147147 name of the program must be changed in applicable rules and
148148 reference materials, publications, and electronic media only when
149149 proposing, adopting, or amending the rules and when publishing new
150150 or amended reference materials, publications, or electronic media.
151151 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
152152 * * * * *