Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2835 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Taylor (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2835
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 14, 2015;
 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 3; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the name of the program serving certain persons with
 special health care needs and prioritizing services provided under
 the program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The legislature finds that:
 (1)  when proposing, adopting, or amending the rules of
 the Department of State Health Services, or the Health and Human
 Services Commission and when publishing new or amended reference
 materials, publications, or electronic media, the name of the
 Children with Special Health Care Needs Services Program should be
 changed to accurately reflect that the program provides services to
 persons other than children, including persons 21 years of age and
 older who have cystic fibrosis;
 (2)  as of January 31, 2015, persons not lawfully
 present in the United States constituted two-thirds the total
 number of persons served by the program;
 (3)  as of January 31, 2015, the program's waiting list
 for services consisted of 178 persons, more than half of whom were
 identified as persons not lawfully present in the United States;
 (4)  if because of financial limitations the program is
 unable to serve all persons eligible for services under the
 program, some persons placed on the program's waiting list may not
 receive the services;
 (5)  the only authority the state may exercise to
 address the limited availability of services when financial
 limitations exist is for the state to give priority for services to
 citizens of the United States who are on the program's waiting list;
 and
 (6)  it is the policy of this state that, when financial
 limitations restrict the number of persons served by the program,
 citizens of the United States who are on the program's waiting list
 for services should be given priority over persons not lawfully
 present in the United States.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Chapter 35, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 35. TEXAS [CHILDREN WITH] SPECIAL HEALTH CARE NEEDS PROGRAM
 SECTION 3.  Section 35.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 35.001.  SHORT TITLE; REFERENCE IN OTHER LAW. (a)  This
 chapter may be cited as the Texas [Children with] Special Health
 Care Needs Program [Services] Act.
 (b)  A reference in other law to the Children with Special
 Health Care Needs Services Program means the program administered
 under this chapter.
 SECTION 4.  Section 35.0021, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (6-a) and amending Subdivision (8) to
 read as follows:
 (6-a)  "Person with special health care needs" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 35.0022.
 (8)  "Program" means the services program for persons
 [children] with special health care needs.
 SECTION 5.  Section 35.0022, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 35.0022.  PERSON [CHILD] WITH SPECIAL HEALTH CARE
 NEEDS.  (a)  In this chapter, "person [child] with special health
 care needs" means a person who:
 (1)  is younger than 21 years of age and who has a
 chronic physical or developmental condition; or
 (2)  has cystic fibrosis, regardless of the person's
 age.
 (b)  The term "person ["child] with special health care
 needs" may include a person who has a behavioral or emotional
 condition that accompanies the person's physical or developmental
 condition. The term does not include a person who has a behavioral
 or emotional condition without having an accompanying physical or
 developmental condition.
 (c)  A reference in this chapter to a "child with special
 health care needs" means a "person with special health care needs"
 and a reference to a "child" means a "person."
 SECTION 6.  The heading to Section 35.003, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 35.003.  SERVICES PROGRAM FOR PERSONS [CHILDREN] WITH
 SPECIAL HEALTH CARE NEEDS.
 SECTION 7.  Section 35.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (d) and adding Subsection
 (c-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  The program is in the department to provide services to
 eligible persons [children] with special health care needs. The
 program shall provide:
 (1)  early identification of persons [children] with
 special health care needs;
 (2)  diagnosis and evaluation of persons [children]
 with special health care needs;
 (3)  rehabilitation services to persons [children]
 with special health care needs;
 (4)  development and improvement of standards and
 services for persons [children] with special health care needs;
 (5)  case management services;
 (6)  other family support services; and
 (7)  access to health benefits plan coverage under
 Section 35.0031.
 (c-1)  To the extent allowed by federal law, the executive
 commissioner shall adopt rules requiring the department to give
 priority for services provided under the program to an eligible
 person who is placed on a waiting list under Subsection (c) based on
 the following criteria in order of importance:
 (1)  the acuity of the person's medical condition;
 (2)  whether the person is a United States citizen or a
 qualified alien as that term is defined by 8 U.S.C. Section 1641(b);
 (3)  the amount of time the person has been on the
 waiting list; and
 (4)  any other factors considered relevant by the
 department.
 (d)  The program may provide:
 (1)  transportation and subsistence for an eligible
 person [child] with special health care needs and the person's
 [child's] parent, managing conservator, guardian, or other adult
 caretaker approved by the program to obtain services provided by
 the program; and
 (2)  the following services to an eligible person
 [child] with special health care needs who dies in an approved
 facility outside the person's [child's] municipality of residence
 while receiving program services:
 (A)  the transportation of the person's [child's]
 remains, and the transportation of a parent or other person
 accompanying the remains, from the facility to the place of burial
 in this state that is designated by the parent or other person
 legally responsible for interment;
 (B)  the expense of embalming, if required for
 transportation;
 (C)  the cost of a coffin purchased at a minimum
 price, if a coffin is required for transportation; and
 (D)  any other necessary expenses directly
 related to the care and return of the person's [child's] remains to
 the place of burial in this state.
 SECTION 8.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to an
 eligible person placed on a waiting list under Section 35.003(c),
 Health and Safety Code, following an initial determination or
 redetermination of the person's eligibility for services under
 Chapter 35, Health and Safety Code, that is made on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 9.  Not later than September 1, 2019, the name of the
 Children with Special Health Care Needs Program operated under
 Chapter 35, Health and Safety Code, must be updated in applicable
 rules and reference materials, publications, and electronic media
 to reflect the change in law made by this Act. Before that date, the
 name of the program must be changed in applicable rules and
 reference materials, publications, and electronic media only when
 proposing, adopting, or amending the rules and when publishing new
 or amended reference materials, publications, or electronic media.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *