Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1165
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2015
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#402
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#387
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Morrison
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Postponed
|
4/27/15 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Postponed
|
4/21/15 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 752
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 752
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|