Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2903 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 10, 2015

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Witness List February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill April 28, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015