Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2903 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 2903
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KolkhorstX
 CampbellX
 EstesX
 PerryX
 RodríguezX
 TaylorofCollinX
 UrestiX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to training requirements for certain child-care workers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.0421, Human Resources Code, as
 amended by S.B. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2015, is amended by amending Subsections (a) and (f) and adding
 Subsections (a-1), (a-2), and (j) to read as follows:
 (a)  The minimum training standards prescribed by the
 executive commissioner under Section  42.042(p) for an employee,
 director, or operator of a day-care center, group day-care home, or
 registered family home must include:
 (1)  48 [24] hours of initial training [that must be
 completed not later than the 90th day after the employee's first day
 of employment] for an employee of a day-care center who has no
 previous training or less than two years of employment experience
 in a regulated child-care facility, subject to the following
 requirements:
 (A)  the employee must complete the initial
 training not later than the first anniversary of the employee's
 first day of employment;
 (B)  the employee must complete at least 32 hours
 of the initial training not later than the 90th day after the
 employee's first day of employment; and
 (C)  the employee must complete at least 16 [,
 eight] hours of the initial training [which must be completed]
 before the employee is given responsibility for a group of
 children;
 (2)  24 hours of annual training for each employee of a
 day-care center or group day-care home who has completed the
 initial training required by Subdivision (1), excluding the
 director, which must include at least:
 (A)  six hours of training in one or more of the
 following areas:
 (i)  [(A)] child growth and development;
 (ii)  [(B)] guidance and discipline; and
 (iii)  [(C)] age-appropriate curriculum;
 and
 (B)  six hours of training in
 [(D)]  teacher-child interaction; and
 (3)  30 hours of annual training for each director of a
 day-care center or group day-care home, or operator of a registered
 family home, which must include at least six hours of training in
 one or more of the following areas:
 (A)  child growth and development;
 (B)  guidance and discipline;
 (C)  age-appropriate curriculum; and
 (D)  teacher-child interaction.
 (a-1)  The minimum training standards prescribed under
 Subsection (a) do not apply to an employee of a day-care center that
 is accredited by a national organization or that is recognized by
 the Texas Rising Star provider certification program as a four-star
 provider.
 (a-2)  Thirty hours of the initial training required under
 Subsection (a)(1), and the 12 hours of annual training required
 under Subsections (a)(2)(A) and (B) must be provided by a person who
 meets at least one of the qualifications listed under Subsection
 (f)(1), (2), (3), (4), or (7).
 (f)  The training required by this section must be
 appropriately targeted and relevant to the age of the children who
 will receive care from the individual receiving training and must
 be provided by a person who:
 (1)  is a training provider registered with the Texas
 Early Childhood Professional Development System's Texas Trainer
 Registry that is maintained by the Texas Head Start State
 Collaboration Office;
 (2)  is an instructor at a public or private secondary
 school, an institution of higher education, as defined by Section
 61.003, Education Code, or a private college or university
 accredited by a recognized accrediting agency who teaches early
 childhood development or another relevant course, as determined by
 rules adopted by the commissioner of education and the commissioner
 of higher education;
 (3)  is an employee of a state agency with relevant
 expertise;
 (4)  is a physician, psychologist, licensed
 professional counselor, social worker, or registered nurse;
 (5)  holds a generally recognized credential [or
 possesses documented knowledge] relevant to the training the person
 will provide;
 (6)  is a registered family home care provider or
 director of a day-care center or group day-care home in good
 standing with the department, if applicable, and who:
 (A)  has demonstrated core knowledge in child
 development and caregiving; and
 (B)  is only providing training at the home or
 center in which the provider or director and the person receiving
 training are employed; or
 (7)  has at least two years of experience working in
 child development, a child development program, early childhood
 education, a childhood education program, or a Head Start or Early
 Head Start program and:
 (A)  has been awarded a Child Development
 Associate (CDA) credential; or
 (B)  holds at least an associate's degree in child
 development, early childhood education, or a related field.
 (j)  The training required by this section may be provided in
 person or online.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.0421(a), Human Resources Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to an employee who is initially
 employed by a day-care center on or after the effective date of this
 Act. An employee who is initially employed by a day-care center
 before that date is subject to the law in effect immediately before
 the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *