E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4771
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1555
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3163
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#945
|
Journal Page: 3163
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3163
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3163
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3065
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#895
|
Journal Page: 3065
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3065
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 3065
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Simpson
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Simpson
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 788
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 788
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|