1 | | - | By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3404 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran |
---|
4 | | - | Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported |
---|
5 | | - | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent |
---|
6 | | - | to printer.) |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 3404 |
---|
19 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
20 | 5 | | relating to a study on providing care to veterans with |
---|
21 | 6 | | post-traumatic stress disorder. |
---|
22 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
23 | 8 | | SECTION 1. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission |
---|
24 | 9 | | shall conduct a study on the benefits of providing integrated care |
---|
25 | 10 | | to veterans with post-traumatic stress disorder. To conduct the |
---|
26 | 11 | | study, the Health and Human Services Commission may coordinate with |
---|
27 | 12 | | a university and medical school with expertise in behavioral health |
---|
28 | 13 | | or post-traumatic stress disorder. The study must evaluate the |
---|
29 | 14 | | benefits of: |
---|
30 | 15 | | (1) using a standardized comprehensive trauma and |
---|
31 | 16 | | post-traumatic stress disorder assessment to identify and target |
---|
32 | 17 | | evidence-based treatment services to provide integrated care for |
---|
33 | 18 | | veterans diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder; and |
---|
34 | 19 | | (2) involving family members in the treatment of a |
---|
35 | 20 | | veteran diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder. |
---|
36 | 21 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2016, the Health and Human |
---|
37 | 22 | | Services Commission shall submit a report containing the results of |
---|
38 | 23 | | the study conducted under Subsection (a) of this section to the |
---|
39 | 24 | | governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of |
---|
40 | 25 | | representatives. The report must include the number of people |
---|
41 | 26 | | served and the type of integrated care provided through the study. |
---|
42 | 27 | | SECTION 2. This Act expires September 1, 2017. |
---|
43 | 28 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
44 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 29 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 30 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 31 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 3404 was passed by the House on May |
---|
| 32 | + | 12, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 8, 2 present, not |
---|
| 33 | + | voting. |
---|
| 34 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 35 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 36 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 3404 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 37 | + | 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 38 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 40 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 41 | + | Date |
---|
| 42 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 43 | + | Governor |
---|