Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3404 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3404
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 CampbellX
 BurtonX
 BirdwellX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 LucioX
 RodríguezX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on providing care to veterans with
 post-traumatic stress disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall conduct a study on the benefits of providing integrated care
 to veterans with post-traumatic stress disorder. To conduct the
 study, the Health and Human Services Commission may coordinate with
 a university and medical school with expertise in behavioral health
 or post-traumatic stress disorder.  The study must evaluate the
 benefits of:
 (1)  using a standardized comprehensive trauma and
 post-traumatic stress disorder assessment to identify and target
 evidence-based treatment services to provide integrated care for
 veterans diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder; and
 (2)  involving family members in the treatment of a
 veteran diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2016, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall submit a report containing the results of
 the study conducted under Subsection (a) of this section to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives. The report must include the number of people
 served and the type of integrated care provided through the study.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *