E
|
06/09/2015
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
July 1, 2015
|
|
E
|
06/09/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/22/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3906
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1542
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1467
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#698
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|