E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 614
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 614
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 516
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 961
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 864
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#79
|
Journal Page: 863
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 608
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 397
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 397
|
House
|
12/03/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|