Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB437 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 437
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 23, 2015;
 March 25, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 8, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 8, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility to participate in health benefit programs
 for certain state employees reemployed after military service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1551.1055, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), [or] (d), or (e),
 eligibility under Section 1551.101 begins not later than the 90th
 day after the date the employee performs services for a state agency
 or is qualified for and begins to hold elected or appointed office.
 (e)  Eligibility under Section 1551.101 for an employee
 reemployed under Chapter 613, Government Code, begins on the first
 day of reemployment on which the employee performs services for a
 state agency.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1601.1045, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), [or] (d), or (e),
 eligibility under Section 1601.101 begins on the first day of the
 calendar month that begins after the 90th day after the date the
 employee performs services for a system.
 (e)  Eligibility under Section 1601.101 for an employee
 reemployed under Chapter 613, Government Code, begins on the first
 day of reemployment on which the employee performs services for a
 system.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *