E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2290
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4336
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1906
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1906
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1308
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#545
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
House
|
05/02/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Israel
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#490
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 334
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 334
|
House
|
12/12/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|