10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to the public transportation advisory committee. |
---|
12 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Sections 455.004(b) and (c), Transportation |
---|
14 | 8 | | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 9 | | (b) The members of the committee shall be appointed by the |
---|
16 | 10 | | governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
17 | 11 | | representatives, who shall each appoint: |
---|
18 | 12 | | (1) one member who represents a diverse cross-section |
---|
19 | 13 | | of public transportation providers and may be employed by a transit |
---|
20 | 14 | | provider or organization representing transit providers; |
---|
21 | 15 | | (2) one member who represents a diverse cross-section |
---|
22 | 16 | | of transportation users and may not be employed by a transit |
---|
23 | 17 | | provider or organization representing transit providers; and |
---|
24 | 18 | | (3) one member who represents the general public and |
---|
25 | 19 | | who may be on the staff of a metropolitan planning organization or |
---|
26 | 20 | | rural transportation planning organization but may not be employed |
---|
27 | 21 | | by a transit provider or organization representing transit |
---|
28 | 22 | | providers. |
---|
29 | 23 | | (c) Members serve for staggered terms of six years, with the |
---|
30 | 24 | | terms of three members expiring on February 1 of each odd-numbered |
---|
31 | 25 | | year. A vacancy on the committee shall be filled in the same manner |
---|
32 | 26 | | as the original appointment for that position [A member serves at |
---|
33 | 27 | | the pleasure of the officer who appointed the member]. A member is |
---|
34 | 28 | | not entitled to compensation for service on the committee but is |
---|
35 | 29 | | entitled to reimbursement for reasonable expenses the member incurs |
---|
36 | 30 | | in performing committee duties. |
---|
37 | 31 | | SECTION 2. (a) The terms of the public transportation |
---|
38 | 32 | | advisory committee members serving on the effective date of this |
---|
39 | 33 | | Act expire January 31, 2017. |
---|
40 | 34 | | (b) The changes in law made by this Act to Section |
---|
41 | 35 | | 455.004(b), Transportation Code, apply only to a member of the |
---|
42 | 36 | | public transportation advisory committee with a term beginning on |
---|
43 | 37 | | or after the effective date of this Act. A member of the public |
---|
44 | 38 | | transportation advisory committee with a term beginning before the |
---|
45 | 39 | | effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect |
---|
46 | 40 | | immediately before that date, and the former law is continued in |
---|
47 | 41 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
48 | 42 | | (c) Notwithstanding the changes in law made by this Act, a |
---|
49 | 43 | | member of the public transportation advisory committee with a term |
---|
50 | 44 | | beginning before the effective date of this Act may be reappointed |
---|
51 | 45 | | to the committee under Section 455.004, Transportation Code. |
---|
52 | 46 | | (d) The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the |
---|
53 | 47 | | house of representatives each shall appoint three members to the |
---|
54 | 48 | | committee, in accordance with Section 455.004, Transportation |
---|
55 | 49 | | Code, as amended by this Act, for terms beginning February 1, 2017, |
---|
56 | 50 | | with one member having a term expiring February 1, 2019, one member |
---|
57 | 51 | | having a term expiring February 1, 2021, and one member having a |
---|
58 | 52 | | term expiring February 1, 2023. |
---|
59 | 53 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
60 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 54 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 55 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 56 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 499 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
| 57 | + | 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 58 | + | voting. |
---|
| 59 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 60 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 61 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 499 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 62 | + | 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 63 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 64 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 65 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 66 | + | Date |
---|
| 67 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 68 | + | Governor |
---|