Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB499 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 499
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the public transportation advisory committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 455.004(b) and (c), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The members of the committee shall be appointed by the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives, who shall each appoint:
 (1)  one member who represents a diverse cross-section
 of public transportation providers and may be employed by a transit
 provider or organization representing transit providers;
 (2)  one member who represents a diverse cross-section
 of transportation users and may not be employed by a transit
 provider or organization representing transit providers; and
 (3)  one member who represents the general public and
 who may be on the staff of a metropolitan planning organization or
 rural transportation planning organization but may not be employed
 by a transit provider or organization representing transit
 providers.
 (c)  Members serve for staggered terms of six years, with the
 terms of three members expiring on February 1 of each odd-numbered
 year. A vacancy on the committee shall be filled in the same manner
 as the original appointment for that position  [A member serves at
 the pleasure of the officer who appointed the member].  A member is
 not entitled to compensation for service on the committee but is
 entitled to reimbursement for reasonable expenses the member incurs
 in performing committee duties.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The terms of the public transportation
 advisory committee members serving on the effective date of this
 Act expire January 31, 2017.
 (b)  The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 455.004(b), Transportation Code, apply only to a member of the
 public transportation advisory committee with a term beginning on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A member of the public
 transportation advisory committee with a term beginning before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before that date, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 (c)  Notwithstanding the changes in law made by this Act, a
 member of the public transportation advisory committee with a term
 beginning before the effective date of this Act may be reappointed
 to the committee under Section 455.004, Transportation Code.
 (d)  The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives each shall appoint three members to the
 committee, in accordance with Section 455.004, Transportation
 Code, as amended by this Act, for terms beginning February 1, 2017,
 with one member having a term expiring February 1, 2019, one member
 having a term expiring February 1, 2021, and one member having a
 term expiring February 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *