Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB771 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Deshotel (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 771
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to funding for the Texas Academy of Leadership in the
 Humanities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 96.707(k), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (k)  For each student enrolled in the academy, the academy is
 entitled to allotments from the Foundation School Program under
 Chapter 42 as if the academy were a school district without a tier
 one local share for purposes of Section 42.253 [, except that the
 academy has a local share applied that is equivalent to the local
 fund assignment of the Beaumont Independent School District].
 SECTION 2.  Section 96.707(k), Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2015-2016 academic year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *