Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB855 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 21, 2015

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill May 12, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015