Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB855 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sanford, et al. H.B. No. 855
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compatibility of state agency websites with certain
 devices and Internet browsers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.134 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.134.  DEVICE AND INTERNET BROWSER COMPATIBILITY.
 (a) In this section, "wireless communication device" means a
 device capable of using a commercial mobile service as defined by 47
 U.S.C. Section 332.
 (b)  The department shall identify the three most commonly
 used Internet browsers and post a list containing those browsers in
 a conspicuous location on the department's Internet website. The
 department shall biennially review and, if necessary, update the
 list required under this subsection.
 (c)  Each state agency that maintains a generally accessible
 Internet website or for which a generally accessible Internet
 website is maintained shall ensure that the website is compatible
 with:
 (1)  a wireless communication device; and
 (2)  the most recent version of each Internet browser
 listed by the department as required under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *