Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2658
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2438
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 930
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#224
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1548
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1548
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 485
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 485
|
House
|
01/28/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|