Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB984 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Deshotel, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 984
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2015;
33 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
44 Affairs; May 18, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
55 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
66 May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
77 Click here to see the committee vote
88 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 984 By: Creighton
99
1010
1111 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1212 AN ACT
1313 relating to birth records of adopted persons; authorizing a fee.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Section 192.008, Health and Safety Code, is
1616 amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (g) and
1717 (h) to read as follows:
1818 (d) Except as provided by Subsections (e), [and] (f), and
1919 (g), only the court that granted the adoption may order access to an
2020 original birth certificate and the filed documents on which a
2121 supplementary certificate is based.
2222 (g) The state registrar shall on written request provide to
2323 a person who was adopted or, if the adopted person is deceased, an
2424 adult descendant, adult sibling, surviving spouse, or adoptive
2525 parent of the adopted person, a noncertified copy of the person's
2626 original birth certificate if:
2727 (1) the adopted person was born in this state;
2828 (2) the request is made on or after the adopted
2929 person's 18th birthday;
3030 (3) a supplementary birth certificate was issued for
3131 the adopted person; and
3232 (4) the person requesting the certificate furnishes,
3333 in person or by mail, appropriate proof of the person's identity.
3434 (h) For a noncertified birth certificate provided under
3535 Subsection (g), the state registrar shall collect a fee in an amount
3636 equal to the fee charged for issuance of any other noncertified
3737 birth certificate and issue the certificate within the time
3838 prescribed for issuance of other noncertified birth certificates.
3939 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 192, Health and Safety
4040 Code, is amended by adding Section 192.0085 to read as follows:
4141 Sec. 192.0085. CONTACT PREFERENCE FORM AND SUPPLEMENTAL
4242 MEDICAL HISTORY FORM. (a) The state registrar shall develop a
4343 contact preference form on which a birth parent shall state the
4444 birth parent's preference regarding contact by an adopted person
4545 who is the biological offspring of the birth parent. The contact
4646 preference form shall provide the birth parent with the following
4747 options:
4848 (1) authorize direct contact by the adopted person;
4949 (2) authorize contact by the adopted person only
5050 through an intermediary selected and identified by the birth
5151 parent; or
5252 (3) not authorize contact by the adopted person.
5353 (b) The state registrar shall ensure that a birth parent who
5454 authorizes contact through an intermediary identifies on the
5555 contact preference form a person to serve as an intermediary and
5656 includes on the form that person's contact information.
5757 (c) The state registrar shall develop a supplemental
5858 medical history form that allows a birth parent to provide
5959 supplemental medical information in addition to the information
6060 included in the adopted person's genetic history report provided
6161 under Section 162.005, Family Code.
6262 (d) The department shall make the contact preference form
6363 and the supplemental medical history form available on the
6464 department's Internet website and make copies of the forms
6565 available in the state registrar's office.
6666 (e) A birth parent may file a contact preference form and a
6767 supplemental medical history form with the state registrar. The
6868 birth parent may return the contact preference form and
6969 supplemental medical history form together to the state registrar.
7070 (f) A birth parent who authorizes direct contact by the
7171 adopted person or contact by the adopted person through an
7272 intermediary by filing the contact preference form with the state
7373 registrar may not change that preference after the preference is on
7474 file with the state registrar. A birth parent may provide updated
7575 intermediary contact information as necessary.
7676 (g) A birth parent who does not authorize contact by the
7777 adopted person may choose to authorize direct contact by the
7878 adopted person or contact by the adopted person through an
7979 intermediary by filing a supplemental contact preference form with
8080 the state registrar authorizing the contact.
8181 (h) The state registrar shall provide copies of the birth
8282 parent's contact preference form and supplemental medical history
8383 form, if available, to an adopted person or other person authorized
8484 to receive a noncertified copy of the adopted person's original
8585 birth certificate under Section 192.008.
8686 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 162, Family Code, is
8787 amended by adding Section 162.0061 to read as follows:
8888 Sec. 162.0061. CONTACT PREFERENCE FORM: NOTICE AND FILING.
8989 (a) The Department of Family and Protective Services or the
9090 licensed child-placing agency, person, or other entity placing a
9191 child for adoption shall:
9292 (1) inform the birth parents of the child:
9393 (A) of the provisions of Chapter 192, Health and
9494 Safety Code, relating to the birth parent contact preference form
9595 and the rights of an adopted child to obtain a noncertified copy of
9696 the adopted person's original birth certificate; and
9797 (B) that the birth parents are required to
9898 provide a completed contact preference form to the Department of
9999 Family and Protective Services or the licensed child-placing
100100 agency, person, or other entity placing a child for adoption;
101101 (2) provide the birth parents of the child with a
102102 contact preference form; and
103103 (3) forward each original completed contact
104104 preference form to the state registrar.
105105 (b) The notice to a child's birth parents required by this
106106 section shall be provided at the time that the birth parent's
107107 parental rights to a child are terminated.
108108 (c) Except as provided by Subsection (d), a petition for
109109 adoption may not be granted until a copy of each birth parent's
110110 contact preference form has been filed.
111111 (d) A court having jurisdiction of a suit affecting the
112112 parent-child relationship may by order waive the contact preference
113113 form filing requirement of this section if the child's birth
114114 parents cannot be located or are deceased or the court determines
115115 that it is in the best interest of the child to waive the
116116 requirement.
117117 SECTION 4. (a) The state registrar shall develop the
118118 contact preference form and the supplemental medical history form
119119 as required by Section 192.0085, Health and Safety Code, as added by
120120 this Act, not later than January 1, 2016.
121121 (b) Notwithstanding Section 192.008(g), Health and Safety
122122 Code, as added by this Act, the state registrar is not required to
123123 comply with that provision until July 1, 2016.
124124 (c) The birth parent of a person who was adopted before
125125 January 1, 2016, may file a contact preference form and a
126126 supplemental medical history form with the state registrar not
127127 later than July 1, 2016, and after that date at the discretion of
128128 the state registrar. Notwithstanding Section 192.0085(f), Health
129129 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a birth parent may file a
130130 supplemental contact preference form changing the birth parent's
131131 contact preference at any time before July 1, 2016. The latest
132132 contact preference form on file with the state registrar and filed
133133 before that date controls.
134134 SECTION 5. Section 162.0061, Family Code, as added by this
135135 Act, applies only to a suit for adoption in which an order
136136 terminating parental rights under Chapter 161, Family Code, is
137137 rendered on or after January 1, 2016. A suit for adoption in which
138138 an order terminating parental rights under Chapter 161, Family
139139 Code, is rendered before January 1, 2016, is governed by the law in
140140 effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
141141 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
142142 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
143143 * * * * *