Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB984 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Deshotel, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 984
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 984 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to birth records of adopted persons; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 192.008, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (g) and
 (h) to read as follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsections (e), [and] (f), and
 (g), only the court that granted the adoption may order access to an
 original birth certificate and the filed documents on which a
 supplementary certificate is based.
 (g)  The state registrar shall on written request provide to
 a person who was adopted or, if the adopted person is deceased, an
 adult descendant, adult sibling, surviving spouse, or adoptive
 parent of the adopted person, a noncertified copy of the person's
 original birth certificate if:
 (1)  the adopted person was born in this state;
 (2)  the request is made on or after the adopted
 person's 18th birthday;
 (3)  a supplementary birth certificate was issued for
 the adopted person; and
 (4)  the person requesting the certificate furnishes,
 in person or by mail, appropriate proof of the person's identity.
 (h)  For a noncertified birth certificate provided under
 Subsection (g), the state registrar shall collect a fee in an amount
 equal to the fee charged for issuance of any other noncertified
 birth certificate and issue the certificate within the time
 prescribed for issuance of other noncertified birth certificates.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 192, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 192.0085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 192.0085.  CONTACT PREFERENCE FORM AND SUPPLEMENTAL
 MEDICAL HISTORY FORM.  (a)  The state registrar shall develop a
 contact preference form on which a birth parent shall state the
 birth parent's preference regarding contact by an adopted person
 who is the biological offspring of the birth parent.  The contact
 preference form shall provide the birth parent with the following
 options:
 (1)  authorize direct contact by the adopted person;
 (2)  authorize contact by the adopted person only
 through an intermediary selected and identified by the birth
 parent; or
 (3)  not authorize contact by the adopted person.
 (b)  The state registrar shall ensure that a birth parent who
 authorizes contact through an intermediary identifies on the
 contact preference form a person to serve as an intermediary and
 includes on the form that person's contact information.
 (c)  The state registrar shall develop a supplemental
 medical history form that allows a birth parent to provide
 supplemental medical information in addition to the information
 included in the adopted person's genetic history report provided
 under Section 162.005, Family Code.
 (d)  The department shall make the contact preference form
 and the supplemental medical history form available on the
 department's Internet website and make copies of the forms
 available in the state registrar's office.
 (e)  A birth parent may file a contact preference form and a
 supplemental medical history form with the state registrar.  The
 birth parent may return the contact preference form and
 supplemental medical history form together to the state registrar.
 (f)  A birth parent who authorizes direct contact by the
 adopted person or contact by the adopted person through an
 intermediary by filing the contact preference form with the state
 registrar may not change that preference after the preference is on
 file with the state registrar.  A birth parent may provide updated
 intermediary contact information as necessary.
 (g)  A birth parent who does not authorize contact by the
 adopted person may choose to authorize direct contact by the
 adopted person or contact by the adopted person through an
 intermediary by filing a supplemental contact preference form with
 the state registrar authorizing the contact.
 (h)  The state registrar shall provide copies of the birth
 parent's contact preference form and supplemental medical history
 form, if available, to an adopted person or other person authorized
 to receive a noncertified copy of the adopted person's original
 birth certificate under Section 192.008.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 162, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 162.0061 to read as follows:
 Sec. 162.0061.  CONTACT PREFERENCE FORM:  NOTICE AND FILING.
 (a)  The Department of Family and Protective Services or the
 licensed child-placing agency, person, or other entity placing a
 child for adoption shall:
 (1)  inform the birth parents of the child:
 (A)  of the provisions of Chapter 192, Health and
 Safety Code, relating to the birth parent contact preference form
 and the rights of an adopted child to obtain a noncertified copy of
 the adopted person's original birth certificate; and
 (B)  that the birth parents are required to
 provide a completed contact preference form to the Department of
 Family and Protective Services or the licensed child-placing
 agency, person, or other entity placing a child for adoption;
 (2)  provide the birth parents of the child with a
 contact preference form; and
 (3)  forward each original completed contact
 preference form to the state registrar.
 (b)  The notice to a child's birth parents required by this
 section shall be provided at the time that the birth parent's
 parental rights to a child are terminated.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), a petition for
 adoption may not be granted until a copy of each birth parent's
 contact preference form has been filed.
 (d)  A court having jurisdiction of a suit affecting the
 parent-child relationship may by order waive the contact preference
 form filing requirement of this section if the child's birth
 parents cannot be located or are deceased or the court determines
 that it is in the best interest of the child to waive the
 requirement.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The state registrar shall develop the
 contact preference form and the supplemental medical history form
 as required by Section 192.0085, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, not later than January 1, 2016.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 192.008(g), Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, the state registrar is not required to
 comply with that provision until July 1, 2016.
 (c)  The birth parent of a person who was adopted before
 January 1, 2016, may file a contact preference form and a
 supplemental medical history form with the state registrar not
 later than July 1, 2016, and after that date at the discretion of
 the state registrar. Notwithstanding Section 192.0085(f), Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a birth parent may file a
 supplemental contact preference form changing the birth parent's
 contact preference at any time before July 1, 2016.  The latest
 contact preference form on file with the state registrar and filed
 before that date controls.
 SECTION 5.  Section 162.0061, Family Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a suit for adoption in which an order
 terminating parental rights under Chapter 161, Family Code, is
 rendered on or after January 1, 2016. A suit for adoption in which
 an order terminating parental rights under Chapter 161, Family
 Code, is rendered before January 1, 2016, is governed by the law in
 effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *