Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2334
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1459
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2872
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#787
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2754
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#736
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2753
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1052
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 485
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 485
|
House
|
01/28/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|