Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB988 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: González, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 988
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 20, 2015, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 988 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study of the feasibility of establishing a visitors
 center at Hueco Tanks State Park in El Paso County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  STUDY. The Parks and Wildlife Department shall
 conduct a study to examine the need for and feasibility of
 establishing a visitors center at Hueco Tanks State Park in El Paso
 County.  The department shall collaborate with the local community
 and surrounding landowners in planning for the development of the
 visitors center site.
 SECTION 2.  REPORT. Not later than May 1, 2016, the Parks
 and Wildlife Department shall report the results of the study to the
 legislature. The report must contain a recommendation on whether
 to establish a visitors center at Hueco Tanks State Park in El Paso
 County.
 SECTION 3.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September
 1, 2015.
 * * * * *