1 | 1 | | By: González, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 988 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 20, 2015, reported |
---|
5 | 5 | | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following |
---|
6 | 6 | | vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 988 By: Rodríguez |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to a study of the feasibility of establishing a visitors |
---|
14 | 14 | | center at Hueco Tanks State Park in El Paso County. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. STUDY. The Parks and Wildlife Department shall |
---|
17 | 17 | | conduct a study to examine the need for and feasibility of |
---|
18 | 18 | | establishing a visitors center at Hueco Tanks State Park in El Paso |
---|
19 | 19 | | County. The department shall collaborate with the local community |
---|
20 | 20 | | and surrounding landowners in planning for the development of the |
---|
21 | 21 | | visitors center site. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. REPORT. Not later than May 1, 2016, the Parks |
---|
23 | 23 | | and Wildlife Department shall report the results of the study to the |
---|
24 | 24 | | legislature. The report must contain a recommendation on whether |
---|
25 | 25 | | to establish a visitors center at Hueco Tanks State Park in El Paso |
---|
26 | 26 | | County. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 3. EXPIRATION. This Act expires January 1, 2017. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September |
---|
29 | 29 | | 1, 2015. |
---|
30 | 30 | | * * * * * |
---|