E | 06/15/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/25/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4774 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4467 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4111 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1858 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1858 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1858 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1858 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1262 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#448 | Journal Page: 2151 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2151 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2134 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 940 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |