Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR80 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2015

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015