Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR80 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Peña (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.C.R. No. 80
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 15, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 FraserX
 EstesX
 BirdwellX
 HallX
 HancockX
 HinojosaX
 LucioX
 NicholsX
 SeligerX
 UrestiX
 ZaffiriniX
 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The famed Battleship Texas, which sits moored at the
 San Jacinto Battleground State Historic Site under the care of the
 Texas Parks and Wildlife Department, is a national treasure that
 played a prominent role in American successes in both World War I
 and World War II; and
 WHEREAS, The "Mighty T" was considered to be one of the most
 powerful weapons in the world when it was commissioned on March 12,
 1914; the ship saw action off the North African coast near Morocco,
 at Normandy on D-Day, and at Iwo Jima and Okinawa in the Pacific
 Theater before being decommissioned on April 21, 1948; suffering
 only one combat casualty in its many campaigns, the Texas earned the
 nickname the "Lucky Ship"; and
 WHEREAS, The Battleship Texas was a harbinger of America's
 rise as an industrialized nation on the verge of becoming a world
 power; in 1916, it became the first U.S. battleship to mount
 antiaircraft guns as well as the first to employ directors and
 range-keepers to control gunfire; other firsts followed, as the
 Texas became the first U.S. battleship to launch an airplane, in
 1919, and the first navy ship to be fitted for commercial radar, in
 1939; and
 WHEREAS, A National Historic Landmark and the flagship of the
 Texas Navy, the Battleship Texas is a living memorial to the brave
 men who served aboard it over the course of more than three decades;
 even in repose, it continues to play an important role in the lives
 of Texans and other Americans, and it is crucial that we preserve
 this vital link to our nation's past; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby respectfully urge the Congress of the United States to
 provide federal funding for repairs to the Battleship Texas; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That the Texas secretary of state forward official
 copies of this resolution to the president of the United States, to
 the president of the Senate and speaker of the House of
 Representatives of the United States Congress, and to all members
 of the Texas delegation to Congress with the request that this
 resolution be entered in the Congressional Record as a memorial to
 the Congress of the United States of America.
 * * * * *