E | 05/18/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3846 | |
E | 05/06/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2811 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1313 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2447 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2452 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1248 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 618 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 892 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |