Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR88 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/01/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 88


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The untimely death of El Paso Constable Robert
 Parker White on November 1, 2014, at the age of 45, brought a great
 loss to many in the community who knew and admired him; and
 WHEREAS, Killed while providing security for an event,
 Constable White had served the residents of Precinct One with the
 utmost distinction for nearly two decades; he was first elected in
 1996 and won reelection four times; during his tenure, he was
 instrumental in helping to develop a constable code of conduct, and
 other officers in his department relied on his extensive experience
 and leadership; he completed numerous state-sanctioned law
 enforcement courses and received a host of accolades for his
 contributions; and
 WHEREAS, This exemplary public servant was especially
 committed to the safety and well-being of area youth, and he was an
 educator as well as a law enforcement officer; for 17 years, Robert
 White was employed as a physical education teacher and coach at
 Putnam Elementary School, and he earned the respect and admiration
 of colleagues and students alike; he was proactive in looking out
 for the students, and he was an exceptionally compassionate and
 caring mentor, counselor, and role model; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Chattanooga, Tennessee, on June 13, 1969, he
 attended Coronado High School and El Paso Community College, where
 he became very active in campus activities; he graduated from the
 Law Enforcement Training Academy and went on to complete his
 bachelor's degree in special education and his master's degree in
 education at The University of Texas at El Paso; and
 WHEREAS, Constable White became involved in civic life at an
 early age, and he was elected president of the El Paso Young
 Democrats; later, he proudly represented the party in his
 successful bids for office, and he was active in Democratic
 initiatives; he volunteered for the Westside Democrats in many
 capacities, including sergeant-at-arms, and he was inducted into
 the El Paso County Democratic Party Hall of Fame; and
 WHEREAS, Devoted to his Catholic faith and to his family,
 Constable White was the loving father of four children,
 Christabelle, Harrison, Allison, and Robert; he loved to act and
 played small roles in local productions, and he also enjoyed
 golfing and following Cowboys football and Chihuahuas baseball, or
 just admiring the El Paso skyline; and
 WHEREAS, Robert White made a positive difference in countless
 lives, and although his time on this earth was far too brief, he
 will forever be remembered for his warmth, kindness, and tremendous
 dedication to public service; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby honor the memory of Constable Robert Parker White and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his parents,
 Tony and Linda de la Cruz and Jack and Debbie White; to his
 children, Christabelle, Harrison, and Allison White and Robert
 White Jr.; to his sisters, Norma Gonzales, Gloria Banda, Kristy
 Barbee, Sondra Lockhart, and Bridget Asher; to his nieces and
 nephews; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Constable Robert Parker White.
 Moody
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 88 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 30, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 88 was adopted by the Senate on
 April 30, 2015, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor