Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR95 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 19, 2015

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2015
Bill April 26, 2015