Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR95 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.C.R. No. 95
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
3- May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Administration; May 18, 2015, reported favorably by the following
5- vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.C.R. No. 95
72
83
94 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
105 WHEREAS, Throughout his life, Roy Houston Moore of Austin
116 contributed in myriad ways to the advancement of the communities he
127 called home, and his passing on September 23, 2013, at the age of
138 81, brought a profound loss to the many people who were fortunate
149 enough to have known him; and
1510 WHEREAS, The son of Lawrence and Lena Moore, Roy Moore was
1611 born on August 30, 1932, in Brownwood and grew up on a farm on the
1712 city's outskirts; after graduating from Brownwood High School in
1813 1950, he enlisted in the United States Air Force and served his
1914 country in the Korean War; he subsequently resumed his studies at
2015 The University of Texas at Austin and graduated in 1958; and
2116 WHEREAS, Mr. Moore enjoyed a distinguished career with
2217 Southwestern Bell, working primarily in Houston; he devoted many
2318 hours of service to civic organizations in the area, including the
2419 Houston Chamber of Commerce and the Greater Houston Convention &
2520 Visitors Council, and he established a second home at his favorite
2621 place on earth, Carancahua Bay, near Palacios; and
2722 WHEREAS, After becoming a lobbyist for Southwestern Bell,
2823 Mr. Moore moved to Austin; he quickly earned the respect and
2924 friendship of many people at the State Capitol, and he continued to
3025 excel in his duties until his retirement from the company in 1996;
3126 he went on to serve as president of Aquasource before fully retiring
3227 in 2002; and
3328 WHEREAS, Blessed with a fine family, Mr. Moore enjoyed a
3429 rewarding marriage with his wife, Julie, and he was a proud and
3530 caring father to his four children, Melinda, Michael, Patricia, and
3631 Megan; an ardent supporter of UT Longhorn athletics, he seldom
3732 missed an opportunity to see his alma mater's football, basketball,
3833 and baseball teams in action; his other passions included golf and
3934 fishing, and he could often be found on Carancahua Bay, where he
4035 took special delight in introducing his grandchildren to the
4136 wonders of reeling in a catch; and
4237 WHEREAS, Roy Houston Moore was an engaged citizen and a man of
4338 rare dedication and generosity, traits that won him the esteem of
4439 countless fellow Texans; his memory remains strong in the hearts of
4540 the friends and loved ones he left behind, and the naming of a reef
4641 near his home on the Gulf Coast will serve as a meaningful tribute
4742 to this admired and accomplished gentleman; now, therefore, be it
4843 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
4944 hereby honor the life of Roy Houston Moore and recognize the reef
5045 that runs along the north side of the pier at 570 El Campo Beach Road
5146 in Calhoun County as Roy's Reef; and, be it further
5247 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
5348 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
5449 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
5550 Roy Houston Moore.
56- * * * * *
51+ Geren
52+ Craddick
53+ ______________________________ ______________________________
54+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
55+ I certify that H.C.R. No. 95 was adopted by the House on May
56+ 5, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not
57+ voting.
58+ ______________________________
59+ Chief Clerk of the House
60+ I certify that H.C.R. No. 95 was adopted by the Senate on May
61+ 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
62+ ______________________________
63+ Secretary of the Senate
64+ APPROVED: __________________
65+ Date
66+ __________________
67+ Governor