Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR95 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.C.R. No. 95
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 18, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Throughout his life, Roy Houston Moore of Austin
 contributed in myriad ways to the advancement of the communities he
 called home, and his passing on September 23, 2013, at the age of
 81, brought a profound loss to the many people who were fortunate
 enough to have known him; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Lawrence and Lena Moore, Roy Moore was
 born on August 30, 1932, in Brownwood and grew up on a farm on the
 city's outskirts; after graduating from Brownwood High School in
 1950, he enlisted in the United States Air Force and served his
 country in the Korean War; he subsequently resumed his studies at
 The University of Texas at Austin and graduated in 1958; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Moore enjoyed a distinguished career with
 Southwestern Bell, working primarily in Houston; he devoted many
 hours of service to civic organizations in the area, including the
 Houston Chamber of Commerce and the Greater Houston Convention &
 Visitors Council, and he established a second home at his favorite
 place on earth, Carancahua Bay, near Palacios; and
 WHEREAS, After becoming a lobbyist for Southwestern Bell,
 Mr. Moore moved to Austin; he quickly earned the respect and
 friendship of many people at the State Capitol, and he continued to
 excel in his duties until his retirement from the company in 1996;
 he went on to serve as president of Aquasource before fully retiring
 in 2002; and
 WHEREAS, Blessed with a fine family, Mr. Moore enjoyed a
 rewarding marriage with his wife, Julie, and he was a proud and
 caring father to his four children, Melinda, Michael, Patricia, and
 Megan; an ardent supporter of UT Longhorn athletics, he seldom
 missed an opportunity to see his alma mater's football, basketball,
 and baseball teams in action; his other passions included golf and
 fishing, and he could often be found on Carancahua Bay, where he
 took special delight in introducing his grandchildren to the
 wonders of reeling in a catch; and
 WHEREAS, Roy Houston Moore was an engaged citizen and a man of
 rare dedication and generosity, traits that won him the esteem of
 countless fellow Texans; his memory remains strong in the hearts of
 the friends and loved ones he left behind, and the naming of a reef
 near his home on the Gulf Coast will serve as a meaningful tribute
 to this admired and accomplished gentleman; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby honor the life of Roy Houston Moore and recognize the reef
 that runs along the north side of the pier at 570 El Campo Beach Road
 in Calhoun County as Roy's Reef; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Roy Houston Moore.
 * * * * *