E | 05/05/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2676 | |
E | 04/27/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2064 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1104 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1946 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1056 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 744 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1469 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1469 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1363 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Filed |