E
|
05/28/2015
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2559
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4574
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1985
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1985
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1985
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1985
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1985
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1985
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1103
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#331
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Postponed
|
4/22/15 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
House
|
01/28/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|