Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR75 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Bonnen of Brazoria, et al. H.J.R. No. 75
2- (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
3- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
4- May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
5- May 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 14,
6- Nays 0; May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.J.R. No. 75
82
93
10- HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
11- proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
4+ A JOINT RESOLUTION
5+ propo
6+ sing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
127 to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part
138 of the market value of the residence homestead of the surviving
149 spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran who died before
1510 the law authorizing a residence homestead exemption for such a
1611 veteran took effect.
1712 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1813 SECTION 1. Section 1-b, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
1914 is amended by adding Subsection (j-1) and amending Subsection (k)
2015 to read as follows:
2116 (j-1) The legislature by general law may provide that the
2217 surviving spouse of a disabled veteran who would have qualified for
2318 an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market
2419 value of the disabled veteran's residence homestead under
2520 Subsection (i) of this section if that subsection had been in effect
2621 on the date the disabled veteran died is entitled to an exemption
2722 from ad valorem taxation of the same portion of the market value of
2823 the same property to which the disabled veteran's exemption would
2924 have applied if the surviving spouse otherwise meets the
3025 requirements of Subsection (j) of this section.
3126 (k) The legislature by general law may provide that if a
3227 surviving spouse who qualifies for an exemption in accordance with
3328 Subsection (j) or (j-1) of this section subsequently qualifies a
3429 different property as the surviving spouse's residence homestead,
3530 the surviving spouse is entitled to an exemption from ad valorem
3631 taxation of the subsequently qualified homestead in an amount equal
3732 to the dollar amount of the exemption from ad valorem taxation of
3833 the former homestead in accordance with Subsection (j) or (j-1) of
3934 this section in the last year in which the surviving spouse received
4035 an exemption in accordance with the applicable [that] subsection
4136 for that homestead if the surviving spouse has not remarried since
4237 the death of the disabled veteran.
4338 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
4439 the Texas Constitution:
4540 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
4641 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
4742 Regular Session, 2015, authorizing the legislature to exempt from
4843 ad valorem taxation all or part of the market value of the residence
4944 homestead of certain surviving spouses of 100 percent or totally
5045 disabled veterans.
5146 (b) The amendments to Section 1-b, Article VIII, of this
5247 constitution take effect January 1, 2016, and apply only to ad
5348 valorem taxes imposed for a tax year beginning on or after that
5449 date.
5550 (c) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2017.
5651 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
5752 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
5853 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
5954 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
6055 legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of
6156 all or part of the market value of the residence homestead of the
6257 surviving spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran who
6358 died before the law authorizing a residence homestead exemption for
6459 such a veteran took effect."
65- * * * * *
60+ ______________________________ ______________________________
61+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
62+ I certify that H.J.R. No. 75 was passed by the House on April
63+ 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, 2 present, not
64+ voting.
65+ ______________________________
66+ Chief Clerk of the House
67+ I certify that H.J.R. No. 75 was passed by the Senate on May
68+ 24, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 2, 1 present, not
69+ voting.
70+ ______________________________
71+ Secretary of the Senate
72+ RECEIVED: _____________________
73+ Date
74+ _____________________
75+ Secretary of State