Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR75 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bonnen of Brazoria, et al. H.J.R. No. 75
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14,
 Nays 0; May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part
 of the market value of the residence homestead of the surviving
 spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran who died before
 the law authorizing a residence homestead exemption for such a
 veteran took effect.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1-b, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended by adding Subsection (j-1) and amending Subsection (k)
 to read as follows:
 (j-1)  The legislature by general law may provide that the
 surviving spouse of a disabled veteran who would have qualified for
 an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market
 value of the disabled veteran's residence homestead under
 Subsection (i) of this section if that subsection had been in effect
 on the date the disabled veteran died is entitled to an exemption
 from ad valorem taxation of the same portion of the market value of
 the same property to which the disabled veteran's exemption would
 have applied if the surviving spouse otherwise meets the
 requirements of Subsection (j) of this section.
 (k)  The legislature by general law may provide that if a
 surviving spouse who qualifies for an exemption in accordance with
 Subsection (j) or (j-1) of this section subsequently qualifies a
 different property as the surviving spouse's residence homestead,
 the surviving spouse is entitled to an exemption from ad valorem
 taxation of the subsequently qualified homestead in an amount equal
 to the dollar amount of the exemption from ad valorem taxation of
 the former homestead in accordance with Subsection (j) or (j-1) of
 this section in the last year in which the surviving spouse received
 an exemption in accordance with the applicable [that] subsection
 for that homestead if the surviving spouse has not remarried since
 the death of the disabled veteran.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, authorizing the legislature to exempt from
 ad valorem taxation all or part of the market value of the residence
 homestead of certain surviving spouses of 100 percent or totally
 disabled veterans.
 (b)  The amendments to Section 1-b, Article VIII, of this
 constitution take effect January 1, 2016, and apply only to ad
 valorem taxes imposed for a tax year beginning on or after that
 date.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of
 all or part of the market value of the residence homestead of the
 surviving spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran who
 died before the law authorizing a residence homestead exemption for
 such a veteran took effect."
 * * * * *