House | 05/23/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4046 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4046 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2653 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Filed |