House | 05/26/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4047 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4047 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 2656 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Filed |