House | 03/01/2015 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 388 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 388 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/16/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/12/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 316 | |
House | 02/02/2015 | Filed |