E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4815
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4815
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4815
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4815
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4781
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4781
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1941
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1066
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 295
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|