E | 06/17/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3647 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2862 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3102 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2407 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4701 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Record vote | RV#1533 | Journal Page: 4700 |
House | 05/26/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4700 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4700 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Postponed | 5/26/15 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 4476 |
House | 05/25/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4476 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4362 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4362 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Postponed | 5/24/15 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 4281 |
House | 05/23/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Bell | Journal Page: 4281 |
House | 05/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4281 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2650 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2263 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2263 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2062 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1109 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1109 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1109 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1109 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1108 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1108 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1108 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 414 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 414 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |