Senate | 05/24/2015 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4358 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Record vote | RV#1392 | Journal Page: 4357 |
House | 05/24/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4357 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4357 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4284 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 4284 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 2-Burrows | Journal Page: 4284 |
House | 05/23/2015 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Journal Page: 4284 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-Burrows | Journal Page: 4282 |
House | 05/23/2015 | Amended | 1-Dutton | Journal Page: 4282 |
House | 05/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4281 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2559 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 983 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 571 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 152 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |