LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB135
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB135
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB135
Compare Versions
SB135 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB135 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB135 Comm Sub May 4, 2015
SB135 Engrossed March 23, 2015
SB135 Comm Sub March 16, 2015
SB135 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB135 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB135 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB135 Comm Sub May 4, 2015
SB135 Engrossed March 23, 2015
SB135 Comm Sub March 16, 2015
SB135 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare