Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill November 10, 2014

House Committee Report

Analysis February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note February 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015