House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1047 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1047 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1047 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1047 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 491 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 491 | |
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |