Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1368 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fraser S.B. No. 1368
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 14, 2015,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0, 1 present not voting;
 April 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1368 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of state aid to certain local governments
 disproportionately affected by the granting of ad valorem tax
 relief to disabled veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 140, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 140.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 140.011.  LOCAL GOVERNMENTS DISPROPORTIONATELY
 AFFECTED BY PROPERTY TAX RELIEF FOR DISABLED VETERANS. (a)  In
 this section:
 (1)  "General fund revenue" means revenue generated by
 a local government from the following sources during a fiscal year
 and deposited in the dedicated general operating fund of the local
 government during that fiscal year:
 (A)  ad valorem taxes;
 (B)  sales and use taxes;
 (C)  franchise taxes, fees, or assessments
 charged for use of the local government's right-of-way;
 (D)  building and development fees, including
 permit and inspection fees;
 (E)  court fines and fees;
 (F)  other fees, assessments, and charges; and
 (G)  interest earned by the local government.
 (2)  "Local government" means:
 (A)  a municipality adjacent to a United States
 military installation; and
 (B)  a county in which a United States military
 installation is wholly or partly located.
 (3)  "Qualified local government" means a local
 government entitled to a disabled veteran assistance payment under
 this section.
 (b)  To serve the state purpose of ensuring that the cost of
 providing ad valorem tax relief to disabled veterans is shared
 equitably among the residents of this state, a local government is
 entitled to a disabled veteran assistance payment from the state
 for each fiscal year that the local government is a qualified local
 government.  A local government is a qualified local government for
 a fiscal year if the amount of lost ad valorem tax revenue
 calculated under Subsection (c) for that fiscal year is equal to or
 greater than two percent of the local government's general fund
 revenue for that fiscal year.
 (c)  For the purposes of this section, the amount of a local
 government's lost ad valorem tax revenue for a fiscal year is
 calculated by multiplying the ad valorem tax rate adopted by the
 local government under Section 26.05, Tax Code, for the tax year in
 which the fiscal year begins by the total appraised value of all
 property located in the local government that is granted an
 exemption from taxation under Section 11.131, Tax Code, for that
 tax year.
 (d)  A disabled veteran assistance payment made to a
 qualified local government for a fiscal year is calculated by
 subtracting from the local government's lost ad valorem tax revenue
 calculated under Subsection (c) for that fiscal year an amount
 equal to one percent of the local government's general fund revenue
 for that fiscal year.
 (e)  Not later than April 1 of the first year following the
 end of a fiscal year for which a qualified local government is
 entitled to a disabled veteran assistance payment, a qualified
 local government may submit an application to the comptroller to
 receive a disabled veteran assistance payment for that fiscal year.
 The application must be made on a form prescribed by the
 comptroller.  The comptroller may require the qualified local
 government to submit an independent audit otherwise required by law
 to be prepared for the local government for the fiscal year for
 which a qualified local government is entitled to the payment.
 (f)  A qualified local government that does not submit an
 application to the comptroller by the date prescribed by Subsection
 (e) is not entitled to a disabled veteran assistance payment for the
 fiscal year for which that deadline applies.
 (g)  The comptroller shall review each application by a local
 government to determine whether the local government is entitled to
 a disabled veteran assistance payment.  If the comptroller
 determines that the local government is entitled to the payment,
 the comptroller shall remit the payment from available funds to the
 qualified local government not later than the 30th day after the
 date the application for the payment is made.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable, but not later than
 December 1, 2015, the comptroller of public accounts shall develop
 the disabled veteran assistance payment form required by Section
 140.011(e), Local Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  A local government that is a qualified local
 government, as that term is defined by Section 140.011(a), Local
 Government Code, as added by this Act, for a fiscal year that began
 in the 2014 tax year is eligible to apply for a disabled veteran
 assistance payment as prescribed by Section 140.011, Local
 Government Code, for that fiscal year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *