Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1368 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Fraser S.B. No. 1368
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 14, 2015,
4- reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
5- following vote: Yeas 13, Nays 0, 1 present not voting;
6- April 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1368 By: Bettencourt
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
136 relating to the provision of state aid to certain local governments
147 disproportionately affected by the granting of ad valorem tax
158 relief to disabled veterans.
169 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1710 SECTION 1. Chapter 140, Local Government Code, is amended
1811 by adding Section 140.011 to read as follows:
1912 Sec. 140.011. LOCAL GOVERNMENTS DISPROPORTIONATELY
2013 AFFECTED BY PROPERTY TAX RELIEF FOR DISABLED VETERANS. (a) In
2114 this section:
2215 (1) "General fund revenue" means revenue generated by
2316 a local government from the following sources during a fiscal year
2417 and deposited in the dedicated general operating fund of the local
2518 government during that fiscal year:
2619 (A) ad valorem taxes;
2720 (B) sales and use taxes;
2821 (C) franchise taxes, fees, or assessments
2922 charged for use of the local government's right-of-way;
3023 (D) building and development fees, including
3124 permit and inspection fees;
3225 (E) court fines and fees;
3326 (F) other fees, assessments, and charges; and
3427 (G) interest earned by the local government.
3528 (2) "Local government" means:
3629 (A) a municipality adjacent to a United States
3730 military installation; and
3831 (B) a county in which a United States military
3932 installation is wholly or partly located.
4033 (3) "Qualified local government" means a local
4134 government entitled to a disabled veteran assistance payment under
4235 this section.
4336 (b) To serve the state purpose of ensuring that the cost of
4437 providing ad valorem tax relief to disabled veterans is shared
4538 equitably among the residents of this state, a local government is
4639 entitled to a disabled veteran assistance payment from the state
4740 for each fiscal year that the local government is a qualified local
4841 government. A local government is a qualified local government for
4942 a fiscal year if the amount of lost ad valorem tax revenue
5043 calculated under Subsection (c) for that fiscal year is equal to or
5144 greater than two percent of the local government's general fund
5245 revenue for that fiscal year.
5346 (c) For the purposes of this section, the amount of a local
5447 government's lost ad valorem tax revenue for a fiscal year is
5548 calculated by multiplying the ad valorem tax rate adopted by the
5649 local government under Section 26.05, Tax Code, for the tax year in
5750 which the fiscal year begins by the total appraised value of all
5851 property located in the local government that is granted an
5952 exemption from taxation under Section 11.131, Tax Code, for that
6053 tax year.
6154 (d) A disabled veteran assistance payment made to a
6255 qualified local government for a fiscal year is calculated by
6356 subtracting from the local government's lost ad valorem tax revenue
6457 calculated under Subsection (c) for that fiscal year an amount
6558 equal to one percent of the local government's general fund revenue
6659 for that fiscal year.
6760 (e) Not later than April 1 of the first year following the
6861 end of a fiscal year for which a qualified local government is
6962 entitled to a disabled veteran assistance payment, a qualified
7063 local government may submit an application to the comptroller to
7164 receive a disabled veteran assistance payment for that fiscal year.
7265 The application must be made on a form prescribed by the
7366 comptroller. The comptroller may require the qualified local
7467 government to submit an independent audit otherwise required by law
7568 to be prepared for the local government for the fiscal year for
7669 which a qualified local government is entitled to the payment.
7770 (f) A qualified local government that does not submit an
7871 application to the comptroller by the date prescribed by Subsection
7972 (e) is not entitled to a disabled veteran assistance payment for the
8073 fiscal year for which that deadline applies.
8174 (g) The comptroller shall review each application by a local
8275 government to determine whether the local government is entitled to
8376 a disabled veteran assistance payment. If the comptroller
8477 determines that the local government is entitled to the payment,
8578 the comptroller shall remit the payment from available funds to the
8679 qualified local government not later than the 30th day after the
8780 date the application for the payment is made.
8881 SECTION 2. As soon as practicable, but not later than
8982 December 1, 2015, the comptroller of public accounts shall develop
9083 the disabled veteran assistance payment form required by Section
9184 140.011(e), Local Government Code, as added by this Act.
9285 SECTION 3. A local government that is a qualified local
9386 government, as that term is defined by Section 140.011(a), Local
9487 Government Code, as added by this Act, for a fiscal year that began
9588 in the 2014 tax year is eligible to apply for a disabled veteran
9689 assistance payment as prescribed by Section 140.011, Local
9790 Government Code, for that fiscal year.
9891 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9992 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
10093 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
10194 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
10295 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
103- * * * * *