House
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 134
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 134
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|