Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill November 10, 2014

House Committee Report

Analysis February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Analysis February 1, 2025
Witness List February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015